GA SB572 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Probate Court of Morgan County; to identify the authorized uses of such technology fee; to provide for the termination of such technology fee and dedication of residual funds to technology uses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Probate Court of Morgan County; assessment and collection of a technology fee; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #763 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #672 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #672 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |