GA SB382 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to theft, so as to provide for the crime of retail theft; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Theft; provide for the crime of retail theft; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #764 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #768 (Y: 159 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #538 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #768 (Y: 159 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #538 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 566 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |