GA SB361 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 31 and 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health and professions and businesses, respectively, so as to expand provisions relating to the accreditation of health care facilities to recognize the inclusion of additional nationally recognized health care accreditation bodies; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Healthcare Facilities; expand provisions; nationally recognized health care accreditation body
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. George Hooks [D] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #718 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #497 - Passage As Amended (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #497 - Passage As Amended (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-19 | Act 611 | |
2012-04-19 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Read and Referred |