GA SB349 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 37 of the O.C.G.A., relating to mental health, so as to provide for changes to the powers and duties of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Behavorial Health and Developmental, Dept. of; changes to the powers and duties
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House Vote #730 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-16 | Act 538 | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |