GA SB244 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-26-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to the "Georgia Registered Professional Nurse Practice Act," so as to provide that the performance of health maintenance activities by a designated caregiver shall not be prohibited; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ga. Registered Professional Nurse Practice Act; performance of health maintenance act. by a designated caregiver shall not be prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #905 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House Vote #391 - Pass (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #189 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House Vote #391 - Pass (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #189 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 418 | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-01 | House Insists | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2009-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Read and Referred |