GA SB236 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to cancellation, suspension, and revocation of drivers' licenses, so as to provide for matters relative to drivers' licenses of persons convicted of driving under the influence; to amend Article 7 of Chapter 8 of Title 42 of the O.C.G.A., relating to ignition interlock devices as probation condition, so as to provide the courts with more authority with regard to the availability of ignition interlock device limited driving permits or probationary licenses and habitual violator probationary licenses for drivers convicted of a second DUI; to provide a court the ability to issue a certificate for such permits and licenses; to change provisions relating to proof of compliance with Code Section 42-8-111; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' Licenses; persons convicted under the influence; allow certain drivers with suspended licenses; limited driving permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #871 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #765 - Passage (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #189 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #765 - Passage (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #189 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 579 | |
2012-04-16 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-15 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-21 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred |