GA SB136 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to specialized land transactions, so as to provide for transfer of control of a condominium association in certain circumstances; to set out public policy concerning the standing of condominium associations to file suit; to provide for priority of certain liens against condominium property and against property subject to a property owners' association; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; provide for transfer of control of a condominium association in certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #794 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #437 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #437 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 723 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-02 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-01 | House First Readers | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-01-24 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred |