GA HR1384 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Assessing the Semester and Quarter Systems at USG and TCSG Institutions; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Assessing the Semester and Quarter Systems at USG and TCSG Institutions; create
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Tim Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Adopt: House Vote #850 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68710 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/226679 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68710#24600 |