GA HR1041 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the governing authority of any county or consolidated government shall be authorized to adopt an alternative method of appraisal and assessment of real property located within such county for taxation; to provide for conditions and limitations; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; adopt an alternative method of appraisal and assessment of real property located within the county for taxation; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Brent Cox [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Derrick McCollum [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66834 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/223393 |