GA HB906 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Chamblee, approved March 28, 1935 (Ga. L. 1935, p. 976), as amended, so as to provide legislative findings and intent; to change the corporate limits of the city; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chamblee, City of; provide legislative findings and intent; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #463 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #483 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #483 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Veto V9 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-03 | House | House Hopper |