GA HB865 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 434
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 434
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from Lamar County school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in the amount of $7,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead after a specified five-year phase-in period for residents of that school district who are 70 years of age or older, approved April 24, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 3702), so as to increase such homestead exemption; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lamar County; school district ad valorem tax for educational purposes; provide exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #404 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #404 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Act 434 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-09 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-08 | House | House Hopper |