GA HB740 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 27-1-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding game and fish, so as to provide that full-time military personnel on active duty and their dependents shall be considered residents of this state for procuring certain hunting and fishing licenses in this state; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and fish; full-time military personnel on active duty and dependents be considered residents of state for procuring certain hunting and fishing licenses; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] |
Rep. Bruce Broadrick [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #581 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #488 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #488 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 485 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-14 | House | House Hopper |