GA HB60 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to scholarships, loans, and grants, so as to change certain provisions relating to a service cancelable loan fund and authorized types of service cancelable educational loans; to provide for a State Veterinary Education Board and its membership, powers, and duties; to provide for purchases of loans made for educational purposes to students who have completed a veterinary medical degree program; to provide for consideration for such purchases in the form of services rendered through the practice of certain veterinary medicine specialties in this state; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; service cancelable loan; State Veterinary Education Board; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #253 - Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #118 - Passage (Y: 140 N: 18 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Vote #15 - Attendance (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #118 - Passage (Y: 140 N: 18 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Vote #15 - Attendance (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 80 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-15 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-25 | House First Readers |