GA HB60 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-10A-7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to licensing requirements and exceptions, so as to provide that no person exempt from the licensing requirements of such Code section shall hold himself or herself out as being licensed to practice professional counseling, social work, or marriage and family therapy or use any term or other indicia implying that he or she is licensed to practice professional counseling, social work, or marriage and family therapy or any combination thereof; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Licensing requirements and exceptions; professional counseling, social work, or marriage and family therapy; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Rep. Elly Dobbs [D] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. John Lunsford [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 - Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-02 - House - House Vote #15 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-02-02 - House - House Vote #15 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 342 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-03 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-02 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-02 | House Third Readers | |
2009-01-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-15 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-14 | House First Readers |