GA HB545 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to commencement and service of civil actions, so as to revise provisions relating to service of process; to provide for certification of persons authorized to serve process throughout the state; to provide for service upon persons residing in gated and secured communities; to provide for filing the return of service; to change certain provisions relating to process in civil practice; to provide for certification of certified process servers authorized to serve process throughout the state; to provide for qualifications, procedures, and other matters with respect to such certification; to regulate the professional conduct of certified process servers; to define the crime of impersonating a process server and provide for punishment; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commencement and service of civil actions; service of process; revise provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Seth Harp [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Roger Lane [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #275 - Pass (Y: 161 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-26 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-25 | House First Readers |