GA HB501 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the maintenance of public roads, so as to require the Department of Transportation to remove all trees in the public right of way that are capable of falling on an interstate or limited-access highway; to provide for the department to designate the removal of trees by a third party after a competitive bidding process; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Transportation, Department of; remove all trees in public right of way capable of falling on interstate or limited-access highway; require
Sponsors
Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39372 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/132618 |