GA HB403 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to provide for a tax credit for certain expenses incurred by taxpayers for certain geothermal machinery installations at residential dwellings; to provide for definitions; to provide for terms and conditions; to provide for a sunset date; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credit for certain geothermal machinery installations at residential dwellings; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hopper |