GA HB1501 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the City of Roswell Public Facilities Authority; to provide for a short title and legislative findings; to confer powers and impose duties on the authority; to provide for the membership and the appointment of members of the authority and their terms of office, qualifications, duties, powers, and compensation; to provide for charges; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for tort immunity; to provide for tax exemptions and exemptions from levy and sale; to provide for supplemental powers; to provide for effect on other governments; to provide for liberal construction; to provide for severability; to provide an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Roswell Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Scott Hilton [R] |
Rep. Esther Panitch [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #823 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #746 (Y: 116 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #746 (Y: 116 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Hopper |