GA HB1409 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to torts, so as to limit liability for mental health care providers under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to limit liability for punitive damages; to provide for applicability; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Torts; mental health care providers; limit liability under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #895 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #869 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #854 (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 1st: Senate Vote #853 (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #607 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #869 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #854 (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 1st: Senate Vote #853 (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #607 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Hopper |