GA HB1257 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a Board of Commissioners of Roads and Revenues for the County of Effingham, approved July 26, 1921 (Ga. L. 1921, p. 466), as amended, so as to revise the powers and duties of the chairperson of the board; to provide for meetings; to provide for quorum and voting; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Effingham County; Board of Commissioners of Roads and Revenues; revise powers and duties of chairperson
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Ann Purcell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #707 - Local Calendar (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #707 - Local Calendar (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 488 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-19 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House First Readers |