GA HB1208 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Cobb County, approved March 28, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 3516), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 30, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 3728), so as to change the description of the education districts of such board; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for qualifications, compensation, and chairpersons and vice chairpersons; to provide for elections; to provide for terms; to provide for submissions; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #856 - Supp Local Calendar Without Hb 1113 (Y: 133 N: 28 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #826 - Supplemental Local Consent Calendar #2 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Vote #683 - Local Calendar (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Vote #682 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 41 N: 96 NV: 31 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #826 - Supplemental Local Consent Calendar #2 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Vote #683 - Local Calendar (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Vote #682 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 41 N: 96 NV: 31 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-20 | Act 622 | |
2012-04-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House First Readers |