GA HB1166 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for individual health insurance coverage to children through child-only health plans; to provide for legislative intent; to establish a mandatory, uniform open enrollment period; to provide for definitions; to provide for guaranteed-issue coverage regardless of health status; to provide for special enrollment periods for loss of coverage because of a qualifying event; to provide for a list of qualifying events; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; individual health insurance coverage to children through child-only health plans; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #722 - Passage (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #611 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #611 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 634 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-28 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-27 | House First Readers |