GA HB1118 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the Town of Trion; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the town; to provide for a governing authority of such town and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, vacancies, compensation, expenses, qualifications, prohibitions, conflicts of interest, and suspension and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for inquiries and investigations; to provide for oaths, organization, meetings, quorum, voting, rules, and procedures; to repeal a specific Act; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Trion, Town of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #533 - Local Calendar (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #533 - Local Calendar (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 512 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House First Readers |