FL S1360 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the Joint Committee on the Library of Congress to approve the replacement of the statue of Confederate General Edmund Kirby Smith in the National Statuary Hall Collection with a statue of Mary McLeod Bethune, etc.
Title
National Statuary Hall
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/25/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/17, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1360 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1360/BillText/Filed/HTML |