FL S1274 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1089 (Ch. 2014-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1089 (Ch. 2014-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Postponing the date that certain major structures become ineligible for coverage by the corporation; providing that a condominium association is ineligible for commercial residential wind-only coverage under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1089 (Ch. 2014-140) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1089 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (203472) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/08/14, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/19/14, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1089 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-140
S1672 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-104
S1672 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-104
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |