FL S1008 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Ruth Arizpe by the Palm Beach County Board of County Commissioners; providing for an appropriation to compensate her for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of Palm Beach County; providing a limitation on the payment of compensation and attorney fees, etc.
Title
Relief of Ruth Arizpe by the Palm Beach County Board of County Commissioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6541 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
312 | 546 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1008 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1008/BillText/Filed/HTML |