FL S0778 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replacing the use of the term "racing dates" with "its current meet dates"; expanding the entitlement of pari-mutuel permitholders to lease any and all of their facilities to any holder of a valid pari-mutuel permit, etc.
Title
Pari-mutuel Licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H909 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
H907 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
S804 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-115
H907 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
S804 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-115
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
550 | 01215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
550 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
550 | 475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
550 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/778 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/778/BillText/Filed/HTML |