FL H1379 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employment of persons younger than 21 years of age in adult entertainment establishments; requires adult entertainment establishments to check identification of entertainers; specifies forms of identification that may be used.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-02 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1690 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S796 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7063
H7063 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S796 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7063
H7063 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
562 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |