FL H1279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to FHSAA, including bylaws relating to student residence & transfer approvals, student ineligibility to participate in competition, & investigations into ineligibility to participate; revises composition & terms of FHSAA board of directors; provides restrictions on dues & fees & collection of contest receipts; provides authority to levy penalties; provides requirements for financial & compliance audit; revises student eligibility criteria for participation in extracurricular activities.
Title
High School Athletics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#251 (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Education; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 89 NAYS 26 |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (596813, 768111) |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (351759) |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2013-04-05 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-04 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-20 | House | Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Choice and Innovation Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 1:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1164 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
H1137 (Similar To) 2013-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1137 (Similar To) 2013-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |