FL H1083 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Safe Neighborhood Improvement District Revolving Loan Trust Fund within DLA; provides that balances at end of fiscal years shall remain in trust fund; provides for future review of trust fund.
Title
Trust Funds/Creation/Safe Neighborhood Improvement District Revolving Loan Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1081 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1510 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1510 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1083 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1083/BillText/Filed/PDF |