FL H1071 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies when child believed to be commercially sexually exploited may be taken into custody; provides requirements for handling such children when taken into custody; provides for assessment of such children who are placed in custody of DCF; provides for placement of children found to be at high risk of continued sexual exploitation in protective secure residential treatment programs; provides criteria for placement in residential programs; provides for reports of examiners; requires dependency petitions in certain circumstances; requires report if child does not meet criteria for placement under specified provisions; specifies requirements for DCF if child is placed under specified provisions; requires reassessment of child who runs away & returns; specifies burden of proof in hearings; specifies that safe harbor provisions apply to children who are victims of commercial sexual exploitation.
Title
Commercially Sexually Exploited Children
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Fresen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161) |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0989 (Similar To) 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-160
S0768 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H7141 (Similar To) 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-161, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1666 (Ch. 2014-224)
H1019 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161), CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
S1724 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161)
S0768 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H7141 (Similar To) 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-161, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1666 (Ch. 2014-224)
H1019 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161), CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
S1724 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 524 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1071 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1071/BillText/Filed/PDF |