FL H0567 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires AHCA to establish & implement Medicaid buy-in program for specified individuals with disabilities; provides requirements for program; requires agency to seek by specified date federal waiver approval or submit any state plan amendments necessary to implement program.
Title
Medicaid Expansion through Medicaid Buy-in Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2023-11-30 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-11-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S212 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/567 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/567/BillText/Filed/PDF |