FL H0313 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for identification & location information of current & former military personnel & their spouses & dependents; provides applicability; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Military Personnel and Their Families
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | Rep. Joel Rudman [R] | Rep. Jeff Holcomb [R] |
Rep. Mike Caruso [R] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] | Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#316 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-21 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-04-20 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-30 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-29 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-29 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable with CS by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-20 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S560 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security