FL H0305 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77), CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77), CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits contractor from executing contract with residential property owner for roofing repair or replacement unless certain notice is included; revises Citizens Property Insurance Corporation to include costs of catastrophe reinsurance to its projected 100-year probable maximum loss in its rate calculations; requires corporation to annually implement rate increase that does not exceed certain percent for specified years; requires corporation's budget allocations for salaries for corporation's employees, all employee raises exceeding 10 percent, & employee compensation plan for corporation to be approved by corporation's board of governors; provides that, for award of attorney fees for claim under property insurance policy, application of contingency risk multiplier may be considered only if certain factors have been met; requires written acceptance of actual cash value coverage in homeowner's policy.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Bob Rommel [R] | Rep. Brett Hage [R] |
Rep. Tom Leek [R] | Rep. Lauren Melo [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77), CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104) |
2021-04-26 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-06 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-26 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-24 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | PCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S212 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
S76 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-77, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104)
H717 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104), CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
S1598 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-104, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
S76 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-77, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104)
H717 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104), CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
S1598 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-104, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
489 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 70132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 70152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |