FL H0215 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes absent uniformed services voters & overseas voters to use federal write-in absentee ballot in any state or local election; provides that eligible elector may vote on any ballot measure in election using federal write-in absentee ballot; specifies that vote cast in judicial merit retention election be treated in same manner as vote on certain ballot measures; revises minimum requirements for DOS rules used in determining what constitutes valid vote on federal write-in absentee ballot.
Title
Federal Write-in Absentee Ballot
Sponsors
House Ethics and Elections Subcommittee | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Rep. Larry Ahern [R] | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] |
Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died on Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Ethics and Elections Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/03/14, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-02-18 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 02/18/14, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2014-01-16 | House | Now in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee |
2014-01-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-01-08 | House | CS by Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, 01/08/14, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-10-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0486 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |