FL H0173 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for not-for-profit corporations that operate residential homeowners' associations.
Title
Not-for-profit Corporations that Operate Residential Homeowners' Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-02 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-10-16 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/173 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/173/BillText/Filed/PDF |