FL H0109 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies proposed amendment to U.S. Constitution relating to equal rights for men & women.
Title
Equal Rights for Men and Women
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Judiciary Committee; Rules and Policy Committee |
2016-12-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0194 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/109 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0109/BillText/Filed/PDF |