DE SJR7 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This joint resolution directs DEDO and DNREC to take the lead to work with private sector providers to develop a plan for implementation of such a pipeline extension, as recommended by the “Blue Collar” Task Force.
Title
Requesting That Delaware Economic Development Office And Delaware Department Of Natural Resources And Environmental Control Examine Issues And Opportunities Related To A Natural Gas Pipeline Extension From New Castle County Into Kent And Sussex Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |