DE SJR10 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This resolution establishes the Lyme Disease Prevention Task Force to promulgate a unified strategy to combat Lyme Disease in Delaware.
Title
Establishing A Joint Executive And Legislative Task Force To Study And Make Findings And Recommendations Regarding The Need For A Unified Strategy To Combat Lyme Disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-24 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |