DE SB36 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides a definition for 911 Dispatchers. While referenced in other sections of the Code, including being identified as a first responder in ยง 4319 of Title 11 for purposes of confidentiality of communications by first responders for critical incident stress management services, Dispatchers have not otherwise been defined.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To 911 Dispatchers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2023-04-06 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2023-04-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-03-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |
2023-01-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate |