DE SB308 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Hearing: Jun 18 @ 10:00 am in JFC Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Hearing: Jun 18 @ 10:00 am in JFC Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adopts the Uniform Special Deposits Act (the Act) authored by the Uniform Law Commission. The Uniform Law Commission provides states with non-partisan, well-conceived and well-drafted legislation that brings clarity and stability to critical areas of state statutory law. The Act was adopted by the Uniform Law Commission in October 2023 and has been adopted in 2 states and introduced in 3 other states.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 5 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform Special Deposits Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2024-06-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-05-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |