DE SB276 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill names the Newark Regional Transportation Center after United States Senator Thomas R. Carper.
Title
An Act To Rename The Newark Regional Transportation Center In Honor Of United States Senator Thomas R. Carper.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-04-19 | Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2024-04-18 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in House | |
2024-04-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 Favorable | |
2024-04-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |