DE SB261 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill grants pension increases to retired State Employees, retired Judges, retired “New” State police and retired County/Municipal Police/Firefighters on January 1, 2015 for persons whose pension benefit was effective on or before June 30, 2013 and is payable on January 1, 2015.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Post-retirement Increases To Pensioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |