DE SB257 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In 2012, the General Assembly passed Senate Bill No. 227 which established the "Quality Assurance Fund". Fees collected under this legislation are placed into the Fund and are in turn matched by federal Medicaid dollars resulting in increased Medicaid re-impressment rates for long term care providers. That legislation contained a Sunset date of December 31, 2015. This bill would merely extend that Sunset date until December 31, 2018.
Title
An Act To Amend Delaware Laws Relating To Quality Assessment Fees On Nursing Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2014-06-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |