DE SB25 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation eliminates the requirement that the Delaware Thoroughbred Racing Commission has to maintain an office in the City of Wilmington.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Thoroughbred Racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 6 Favorable |
2013-04-17 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate |