DE SB217 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill repeals the provision of the Delaware code requiring the revocation of the driver’s license of any individual of a drug offense, regardless of whether the offense is related to the operation of a motor vehicle.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rules Of The Road.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 30 YES 10 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 5 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |