DE SB210 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - SS 1 for SB 210 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - SS 1 for SB 210 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill changes the composition of the Professional Standards Board by reducing the number of members. It also changes the term of membership from 4 years to 3 years.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Professional Standards Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 210 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 210 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-06-05 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 210 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-05 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 210 - Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 210 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2014-06-03 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 210 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-05-14 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 210 - Re-Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 210 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |