DE SB192 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
In 2015, the General Assembly, in Chapter 28 of Volume 80 of the Laws of Delaware, designated as subsection (d) the last sentence of § 4201(c) of Title 11 regarding attempts to commit a felony listed as a violent felony (the last sentence). The clear intent of the 2015 legislation was to make a technical correction, not to make a substantive change. However, the General Assembly should have designated the last sentence as paragraph (c)(2), as the intent of the General Assembly was to maintain the connection between the violent felony list and the last sentence, such that citations to § 4201(c) of Title 11 were intended to reference both the violent felony list and the last sentence. This Act makes a technical correction of this inadvertent Delaware Code designation error.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Classification Of Offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2023-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-23 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2023-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |