DE SB182 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a check box for donations to the Protecting Delaware’s Children Fund on the individual income tax return. All amounts designated to this Fund would be forwarded to the Delaware Community Foundation for use in public awareness campaigns promoting the reporting of child abuse.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Income Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits |
2014-06-04 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |