DE SB168 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides the option for Local Education Agencies (LEAs) to develop alternative educator evaluation systems for all educators, including novice teachers and specialists, pursuant to the requirement in this section. The bill only addresses 1270(f) and is narrowly-tailored to address only that provision concerning an LEA’s ability to apply for a waiver to the provisions of DPAS-II under the conditions outlined.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educator Evaluations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 12 On Its Merits |
2014-03-26 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |